Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ivanios Givergis Thomas Panikervitis (Panickerveetil)

Deceased

Archbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1882Born
15 Aug 190825.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 192542.6Ordained BishopBishop
20 Sep 193047.9Converted
13 Feb 193249.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Phasis
11 Jun 193249.7AppointedArchbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
15 Jul 195370.8DiedArchbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Ivanios Givergis Thomas Panikervitis (Panickerveetil)
Archbishop Ivanios Givergis Thomas Panikervitis (Panickerveetil) (born , died ) Archbishop of Trivandrum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMavelikara (Travancore)
Ordained BishopNiranam
Death PlaceTrivandrum, Archeparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara)

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1925, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,519

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast