Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús María Fajardo, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alghero, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1643Born
18 May 169350.1AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
19 Jul 169350.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
13 Apr 169451.0DiedBishop of Alghero, Italy

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús María Fajardo
Bishop José de Jesús María Fajardo O.A.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Alghero

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 234, Number 1,457
  • bd/d: CB, 19 Jul 2014
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 26
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,587

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast