Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis de Lemos y Usategui, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Concepción, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1627¹Born
16 Sep 168659.7AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
2 Oct 168760.7Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
27 Nov 169265.9ResignedBishop of Concepción, Chile
22 Dec 170275.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Concepción, Chile

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Luis de Lemos y Usategui
Bishop Luis de Lemos y Usategui O.S.A. (born 1627, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopDona Maria Aragon, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 15.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 229, Number 1,422
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 167
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,123
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast