Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ibrahim Michael Ibrahim, B.S.

Archbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1962 Born
15 Aug 198018.3ProfessedMember of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
3 Nov 198523.6Solemn VowsMember of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
9 Jul 198725.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
18 Jul 198725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
18 Jun 200341.2AppointedBishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada
17 Aug 200341.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada
23 Jun 202159.2SelectedArchbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
26 Jun 202159.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Ibrahim Michael Ibrahim
Archbishop Ibrahim Michael Ibrahim B.S. (born ) Archbishop of Zahleh e Furzol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJinsnaya
Ordained BishopSaint-Sauveur, Monastery, Joun

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,440
  • prof/sole/od: CB, 19 Jul 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Aug 2021

Quantcast