Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Gutiérrez Díez

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1878Born
17 Jul 190426.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 193557.1AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
21 Jul 193557.3Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
10 Jun 194365.2AppointedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
2 Apr 196486.0DiedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Gutiérrez Díez
Bishop Tomás Gutiérrez Díez (born , died ) Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanueva de la Peña
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palencia, Diocese of Palencia

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 53
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,918

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast