Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Gregori

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1829Born
18 Sep 185222.8Ordained PriestPriest of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
11 Feb 188959.2AppointedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
1 Mar 188959.2Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
19 Feb 189565.2DiedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Gregori
Bishop Paolo Gregori (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiegaro, Diocese of CittÓ della Pieve
Ordained BishopPerugia, Archdiocese of Perugia

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1889, Number 15
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,040

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast