Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Gillmore Stock

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chile, Military

Titular Bishop of Auzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1908Born
17 Dec 193224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Valparaíso, Chile
16 Oct 195951.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chile, Military
4 Sep 196254.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
4 Sep 196254.6AppointedBishop of Chile, Military
16 Dec 196254.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
26 Nov 198375.8RetiredBishop of Chile, Military
27 May 199082.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Chile, Military

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Gillmore Stock (VIAF: 206145857074122921963)
Bishop Francisco Javier Gillmore Stock (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chile, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIquique

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 186
  • mn/c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast