Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pompeo Ghezzi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

Titular Archbishop of Gabula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1870Born
11 Jun 189222.0Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
27 Nov 191141.4AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
14 Jan 191241.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
25 Oct 195383.3RetiredBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
25 Oct 195383.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gabula
17 Apr 195786.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pompeo Ghezzi
Archbishop Pompeo Ghezzi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorgonzola
Ordained BishopTreviglio, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1912, Number 4
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 97
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,946

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast