Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Gazzoli

Deceased

Bishop of Todi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1760Born
26 Sep 178424.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 179535.5AppointedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
27 Sep 179535.5Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
11 Aug 180040.3AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
23 Sep 180545.5AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
26 Jan 184887.8DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Gazzoli
Bishop Francesco Maria Gazzoli (born , died ) Bishop of Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerni, Diocese of Terni
Ordained BishopCathedral, Frascati, Suburbicarian See of Frascati
Death PlaceTodi, Diocese of Todi
Buried Place (Original)San Bonaventura, Church, Todi, Diocese of Todi

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 52.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 71, and Page 380
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1795, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 168
  • ob/c2+/loc: AT, 16 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Feb 2021

Quantcast