Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Gaddi

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1644³Born
7 Feb 169550.2AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
6 Mar 169550.3Ordained BishopBishop of Spoleto, Italy
Sep 1710³65.8DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Gaddi
Bishop Pietro Gaddi (born , died Sep 1710) Bishop of Spoleto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlž, Diocese of Forli

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1695, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast