Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Venanzio Francesco Filippini, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mogadiscio, Somalia

Titular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1890Born
7 Sep 191323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 May 193342.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio, Somalia
23 May 193342.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia
29 Jun 193343.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia
19 Oct 197080.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio, Somalia
31 Mar 197382.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mogadiscio, Somalia

MicroData Summary for Venanzio Francesco Filippini
Bishop Venanzio Francesco Filippini O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mogadiscio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuvolera, Italy
Ordained BishopTripoli

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 41
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast