Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís Gonzaga Ferreira da Silva, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lichinga, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1923Born
11 Jul 195330.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Nov 197249.6AppointedBishop of Vila Cabral, Mozambique
17 Dec 197249.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vila Cabral, Mozambique
25 Jan 200379.8RetiredBishop of Lichinga, Mozambique
7 Aug 201390.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Lichinga, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Luís Gonzaga Ferreira da Silva
Bishop Luís Gonzaga Ferreira da Silva S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lichinga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRebordões, Portugal
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora dos Gracas, Vila Cabral, Diocese of Vila Cabral

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 8 Aug 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast