Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emilio Ferrais

Deceased

Archbishop of Catania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1869Born
11 Apr 191142.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy
11 Apr 191142.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
21 May 191142.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
12 Dec 192556.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Catania, Italy
22 Jun 192859.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
7 Dec 192859.6SucceededArchbishop of Catania, Italy
23 Jan 193060.8DiedArchbishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emilio Ferrais
Archbishop Emilio Ferrais (born , died ) Archbishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona
Ordained BishopVerona, Diocese of Verona

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1911, Number 40
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,939

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast