Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrés Gabriel Ferrada Moreira

Secretary of the Congregation for the Clergy

Titular Archbishop of Tiburnia

Titular See: (Announced 8 Sep; Effective 1 Oct)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1969 Born
24 Oct 199829.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
3 Jul 199930.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
8 Sep 202152.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tiburnia
1 Oct 202152.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Clergy
17 Oct 202152.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tiburnia

MicroData Summary for Andrés Gabriel Ferrada Moreira
Archbishop Andrés Gabriel Ferrada Moreira (born ) Secretary of Clergy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained DeaconCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained PriestCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for the Clergy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Sep 2021
  • c34: CB, 17 Oct 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Oct 2021

Quantcast