Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Francis Fallon, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1867Born
29 Jul 189427.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
18 Dec 190942.5AppointedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
25 Apr 191042.9Ordained BishopBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
22 Feb 193163.7DiedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Francis Fallon
Bishop Michael Francis Fallon O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKingston
Ordained BishopLondon, Diocese of London, Ontario

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,571

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast