Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luke Fagan

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1656¹Born
1682¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
15 Sep 171357.7AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
18 Feb 171458.1Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland
14 Sep 172973.7SelectedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
24 Sep 172973.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
22 Nov 173377.8DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luke Fagan
Archbishop Luke Fagan (born 1656, died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLick Bla near Castlepollard, Co. Westmeath

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 189, and Page 263
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 37
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,488
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 43, and Page 44
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast