Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Cusack

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633²Born
27 Mar 166027.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Apr 166027.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 167845.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Meath, Ireland
5 Oct 167845.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
1679²46.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
18 Nov 167946.8SucceededBishop of Meath, Ireland
1688¹55.0DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Cusack
Bishop James Cusack (born 1633, died 1688) Bishop of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLismullen, Co. Meath
Ordained PriestSt. Silvestro Oratory
Buried Place (Original)Duleek

  • a priest for 27.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 146, and Page 262
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 29
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast