Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh MacDermot

Deceased

Bishop of Achonry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652¹Born
1675²23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Elphin, Ireland
21 Dec 168331.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Achonry, Ireland
11 Apr 170755.2SelectedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
30 Apr 170755.3ConfirmedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
Sep 1725³73.6DiedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugh MacDermot
Bishop Hugh MacDermot (born 1652, died Sep 1725) Bishop of Achonry

EventPlace
Ordained PriestCloonsellagh

  • a priest for 50.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 67
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast