Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James O’Shielt, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1661¹Born
9 Mar 168625.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
29 Mar 168726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Oct 171756.7AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
5 Dec 171756.9Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
13 Aug 172463.6DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James O’Shielt
Bishop James O’Shielt O.F.M. (born 1661, died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCranfield, Co. Antrim
Buried Place (Original)Ancient graveyard, Ahoghill

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 189
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,974
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast