Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulino do Livramento Évora, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1931Born
16 Dec 196231.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Apr 197543.8AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
1 Jun 197543.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
22 Jun 197544.0InstalledBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
22 Jul 200978.0RetiredBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
16 Jun 201987.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for Paulino do Livramento Évora (VIAF: 63161972)
Bishop Paulino do Livramento Évora C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

EventPlace
Birth PlacePraia
Ordained BishopCacuso, Diocese of Malanje, Angola
Death PlacePraia

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jul 2009
  • d: CB, 16 Jun 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,723

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast