Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mamerto Esquiú y Medina, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1826Born
14 Jul 184216.1ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
18 Oct 184822.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
27 Feb 188053.7AppointedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
12 Dec 188054.5Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
17 Jan 188154.6InstalledBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
10 Jan 188356.6DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
13 Mar 2021Beatified

MicroData Summary for Mamerto Esquiú y Medina (VIAF: 5736460)
Bishop Mamerto Esquiú y Medina O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiedra Blanca, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)
Ordained BishopBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Death PlaceLa Posta de El Suncho

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 226
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 54
  • beat: CB, 18 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast