Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bl. Giuseppe Benedetto Cardinal Dusmet, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Catania, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

Apostolic Administrator of Caltagirone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1818Born
15 Aug 184022.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Nov 184022.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Sep 1841³23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Feb 186748.5AppointedArchbishop of Catania, Italy
10 Mar 186748.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Catania, Italy
18 Jan 188566.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Caltagirone, Italy
11 Feb 188970.4Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 188970.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
4 Apr 189475.6DiedArchbishop of Catania, Italy
25 Sep 1988Beatified

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Giuseppe Benedetto Dusmet (VIAF: 54947226)
Bl. Giuseppe Benedetto Cardinal Dusmet O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopSan Paolo fuori le Mura, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceEpiscopal Palace, Catania, Archdiocese of Catania
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Catania, Archdiocese of Catania

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
  • a cardinal for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Feb 1889
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 192, and Page 52
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1867, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast