Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Dunne

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1745²Born
1769²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 178742.5AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
16 Sep 178742.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
15 Mar 178944.2DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Dunne
Bishop John Dunne (born 1745, died ) Bishop of Ossory

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. James, Chapel, Kilkenny
Death PlaceBishop's House, Dean Street, Kilkenny

  • a priest for 20.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 16
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,680
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast