Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Caulfield

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1732²Born
15 Aug 175725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ferns, Ireland
26 Feb 178250.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ferns, Ireland
26 Feb 178250.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
7 Jul 178250.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Birtha
19 Oct 178654.7SucceededBishop of Ferns, Ireland
12 Jan 181482.0DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Caulfield (VIAF: 315628083)
Bishop James Caulfield (born 1732, died ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaltmills, Co. Wexford
Ordained PriestFerns, Diocese of Ferns
Ordained BishopNew Ross
Death PlaceHigh Street
Buried Place (Original)Franciscan, Chapel, Wexford

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 122, and Page 214
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 10
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,534
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 19, and Page 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast