Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph Hubert Dignan

Deceased

Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1890Born
29 May 191524.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 193444.0AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
19 Mar 193544.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
22 Nov 195867.9DiedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Ralph Hubert Dignan
Bishop Ralph Hubert Dignan (born , died ) Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast