Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauro Diego (Marcos) de Tovar y Valle Maldonado, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1586Born
13 Mar 160014.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Oct 163953.7AppointedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
18 Dec 163953.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
16 Dec 165266.9AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
22 Oct 166680.8DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for Mauro Diego (Marcos) de Tovar y Valle Maldonado
Bishop Mauro Diego (Marcos) de Tovar y Valle Maldonado O.S.B. (born 1586, died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillacastín, Spain

  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148, and Page 363
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 167, Number 1,047
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,639, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast