Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Czaplinski

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1908Born
19 Dec 193123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
20 Jan 194839.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
20 Jan 194839.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Faustinopolis
4 Apr 194839.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Faustinopolis
16 Mar 197364.4AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
30 Dec 198072.2DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Bernard Czaplinski
Bishop Bernard Czaplinski (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrabowo
Ordained BishopSt. John Baptist, Church

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast