Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Omar Félix Colomé

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cruz del Eje, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1932Born
22 Sep 196229.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cruz del Eje, Argentina
27 Sep 198451.7AppointedBishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina
28 Oct 198451.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina
24 Jun 200875.5RetiredBishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina
12 Jul 201582.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Cruz del Eje, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Omar Félix Colomé
Bishop Omar Félix Colomé (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cruz del Eje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArroyito
Ordained BishopCruz del Eje, Diocese of Cruz del Eje

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 12 Jul 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 93, Number 7,902

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast