Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Bitozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1716³Born
11 Jun 174024.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 176549.1AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
9 Jun 176549.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
17 Oct 177963.4DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Bitozzi
Bishop Bartolomeo Bitozzi (born , died ) Bishop of Ripatransone

EventPlace
Birth PlacePreci
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 15
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,632

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast