Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Chisholm

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Oreus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1752Born
17 Apr 177523.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 179139.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
8 Nov 179139.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Oreus
12 Feb 179240.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oreus
8 Jul 181462.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Chisholm
Bishop John Chisholm (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Highland District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrathglass, Inverness
Ordained BishopEdimbourg

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
  • Assisted by:
    • Father Paul MacPherson
      Priest
    • Father Alexandre MacDonald
      Priest
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 319, and Page 455
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 100, Number 8,627

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 9 Dec 2020

Quantcast