Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Antonio Cardinal Cebrián y Valdá

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1734Born
24 Jul 179763.4AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
8 Oct 179763.6Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
7 Jul 181581.3ResignedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
10 Jul 181581.3AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
23 Sep 181682.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 Feb 182085.9DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio Cebrián y Valdá
Francisco Antonio Cardinal Cebrián y Valdá (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Felipe
Ordained BishopValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
  • a cardinal for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Sep 1816
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,508
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 115, Number 605
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 319
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,707

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast