Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Sweetman

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1700¹Born
8 Aug 171717.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Sep 171717.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 174444.9SelectedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
25 Jan 174545.0ConfirmedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
29 Jun 174545.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
19 Oct 178686.7DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Sweetman
Bishop Nicholas Sweetman (born 1700, died ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCollop’s Well near Adamstown, Co. Wexford
Ordained PriestSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
Death PlaceWexford
Buried Place (Original)Clongeen

  • a priest for 69.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 214
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 122, and Page 123
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast