Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Campero y ArŠoz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Salta, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Sophene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1873Born
11 Jun 192349.5AppointedBishop of Salta, Argentina
21 Oct 192349.9Ordained BishopBishop of Salta, Argentina
23 Oct 192349.9InstalledBishop of Salta, Argentina
22 Jun 193460.6ResignedBishop of Salta, Argentina
22 Jun 193460.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sophene
19 Feb 193864.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Salta, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Julio Campero y ArŠoz
Bishop Julio Campero y ArŠoz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Salta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJujuy
Ordained BishopSalta, Diocese of Salta

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1923, Number 60
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast