Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopoldo Buteler

Deceased

Bishop of Río Cuarto, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1882Born
17 Jun 190523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
8 Jan 193249.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
8 Jan 193249.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinum
5 Jun 193250.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinum
13 Sep 193452.3AppointedBishop of Río Cuarto, Argentina
21 Mar 193552.9InstalledBishop of Río Cuarto, Argentina
22 Jul 196179.2DiedBishop of Río Cuarto, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Buteler
Bishop Leopoldo Buteler (born , died ) Bishop of Río Cuarto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Molinos

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast