Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bura

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Limisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1944 Born
6 Dec 197026.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
14 Feb 197126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
3 Jan 200661.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
3 Jan 200661.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Limisa
21 Feb 200661.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limisa
29 Jul 200965.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint Josaphat in Parma (Ukrainian), USA
4 Nov 201470.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Saint Josaphat in Parma (Ukrainian), USA
15 Nov 201975.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Bura
Bishop John Bura (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWegeleben, Germany
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania

Please contact the Bishop through the Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,066
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2019
  • od/c0/loc: CB, 14 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast