Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Brown

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Feb 1435AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
1 May 1435Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
19 Sep 1436AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
6 Dec 1445DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Brown
Bishop Thomas Brown (died ) Bishop of Norwich

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 467, and Page 567
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 205, and Page 224
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 88
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,679

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast