Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Sydenham

Deceased

Bishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Oct 1429AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
12 Feb 1431Ordained BishopBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
27 Feb 1438³DiedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon Sydenham
Bishop Simon Sydenham (died ) Bishop of Chichester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLambeth

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 246
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 187
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 128
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 87
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,677

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast