Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Wells

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1436AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
24 Mar 1437Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
26 Feb 1444DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Wells
Bishop William Wells (died ) Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopDurham House, Westminster

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 567
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 224
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 88
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,682

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast