Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reginald Pecock (Peacock)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chichester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1395Born
142126.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 144449.3AppointedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
14 Jun 144449.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
23 Mar 145055.2AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
4 Dec 145762.9ResignedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
146166.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Chichester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Reginald Pecock (Peacock)
Bishop Reginald Pecock (Peacock) (born 1395, died 1461) Bishop Emeritus of Chichester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWales
Ordained BishopCroydon

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 71, and Page 247
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 128
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 89
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,687

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast