Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Brenan

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel, Ireland

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625¹Born
26 Dec 165328.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jan 165429.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Aug 167146.6AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
6 Sep 167146.6Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
8 Mar 167752.1AppointedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
1693²68.0DiedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Brenan
Archbishop John Brenan (born 1625, died 1693) Archbishop of Cashel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilkenny
Ordained DeaconSt. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestPropaganda College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceTurbid, Co. Limerick

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 147, and Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 43
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast