Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Boulos Nassif Borkhoche, S.M.S.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1932Born
14 Sep 196027.9Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
14 Jun 198350.6AppointedArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
3 Jul 198350.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
15 Sep 201178.9RetiredArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
4 Feb 202188.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Boulos Nassif Borkhoche
Archbishop Boulos Nassif Borkhoche S.M.S.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bosra e Haūrān

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoun
Ordained BishopSaint Paul, Basilica, Harissa, Lebanon
Death PlaceHarissa, Lebanon

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2012, Page 111
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,742
  • d: CB, 5 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast