Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan José Bernal Ortiz

Deceased

Bishop of Los Teques, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1907Born
19 Apr 193023.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 194942.7AppointedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
13 Nov 194942.7Ordained BishopBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
21 Jun 195851.3AppointedArchbishop of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela
25 Jul 196558.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Los Teques, Venezuela
19 Oct 198073.7DiedBishop of Los Teques, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Juan José Bernal Ortiz
Archbishop Juan José Bernal Ortiz (born , died ) Bishop of Los Teques

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDuaca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 104
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast