Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto Berlucca

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1841Born
26 Mar 186422.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 188947.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
23 Jun 188947.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
1 Aug 189654.9DiedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia

MicroData Summary for Augusto Berlucca
Bishop Augusto Berlucca (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Transtevere, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 301
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 33
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,047

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast