Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Barraza Sánchez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mazatlán, Sinaloa, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1928Born
28 Oct 195123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Durango, México
26 Oct 197951.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Durango, México
26 Oct 197951.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Drivastum
25 Jan 198051.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drivastum
19 Oct 198152.9AppointedBishop of Mazatlán, Sinaloa, México
3 Mar 200576.3RetiredBishop of Mazatlán, Sinaloa, México
26 Jul 202091.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Mazatlán, Sinaloa, México

MicroData Summary for Rafael Barraza Sánchez
Bishop Rafael Barraza Sánchez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mazatlán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurango, Archdiocese of Durango
Ordained BishopDurango, Archdiocese of Durango
Death PlaceDurango, Archdiocese of Durango

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 26 Jul 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,687

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast