Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Carlo Baldovinetti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1618Born
163415.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1642²23.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Dec 166749.7AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
18 Dec 166749.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
Sep 1671³53.5DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carlo Baldovinetti
Bishop Giovanni Carlo Baldovinetti O.P. (born , died Sep 1671) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopS. Carlo au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 131
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 124
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 27
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,644

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast