Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Baisi

Bishop of Puerto Iguazú, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1964 Born
21 Nov 199329.3Ordained PriestPriest of San Miguel, Argentina
8 Apr 201045.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
8 Apr 201045.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tepelta
19 Jun 201045.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tepelta
8 May 202055.8AppointedBishop of Puerto Iguazú, Argentina
5 Jul 202055.9InstalledBishop of Puerto Iguazú, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Baisi
Bishop Nicolás Baisi (born ) Bishop of Puerto Iguazú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBella Vista, Diocese of San Martín
Ordained BishopCathedral, La Plata, Archdiocese of La Plata

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Puerto Iguazú.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,659
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 May 2020
  • i: CB, 30 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast