Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop 茳car 聲gel Bernal

Deceased

Bishop of Girardota, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1938Born
26 Aug 196224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sons鏮-Rionegro, Colombia
23 Jan 198647.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sons鏮-Rionegro, Colombia
23 Jan 198647.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tisili
22 Feb 198647.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tisili
18 Jun 198849.8AppointedBishop of Girardota, Colombia
4 Jul 199657.8DiedBishop of Girardota, Colombia

MicroData Summary for 茳car 聲gel Bernal
Bishop 茳car 聲gel Bernal (born , died ) Bishop of Girardota

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Ceja

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • mn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast