Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacob Barnabas Chacko Aerath, O.I.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint John Chrysostom of Gurgaon (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1960Born
1979²18.0First VowsMember of Order of Imitation of Christ
15 May 198524.4Final VowsMember of Order of Imitation of Christ
2 Oct 198625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Imitation of Christ
7 Feb 200746.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bapara
10 Mar 200746.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bapara
26 Mar 201554.3AppointedBishop of Saint John Chrysostom of Gurgaon (Syro-Malankara), India
26 Aug 202160.7DiedBishop of Saint John Chrysostom of Gurgaon (Syro-Malankara), India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacob Barnabas Chacko Aerath
Bishop Jacob Barnabas Chacko Aerath O.I.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint John Chrysostom of Gurgaon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarikulam Kerala
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral, Trivandrum, Archeparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara)
Death PlaceFortis, Hospital, New Delhi

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,345
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2015
  • d: CB, 26 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Aug 2021

Quantcast