Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pedro Nel Ramirez Posada, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Tumaco, Colombia

Priest of Pasto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1914Born
8 Sep 193419.9ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
14 Jul 194934.7AppointedPrefect of Tumaco, Colombia
5 Apr 195439.4ResignedPrefect of Tumaco, Colombia
22 Apr 195540.5IncardinatedPriest of Pasto, Colombia
24 Jul 200085.7DiedPriest of Pasto, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Pedro Nel Ramirez Posada
Father Pedro Nel Ramirez Posada O.A.R. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Tumaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManizales

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • r: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast