Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Simon Faurie, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kuiceu

Titular Bishop of Apollonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1824BornMonségur, France
1850²25.6ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Dec 185026.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
8 Apr 185126.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kuiceu, China
8 Apr 185126.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
2 Sep 186036.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
21 Jun 187147.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Kuiceu, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Simon Faurie:
Bishop Louis-Simon Faurie M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kuiceu

  • a priest for 20.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013